BARKSTON AND SYSTON VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 518101
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

provide falcilities for meetings and hire of hall to local residances

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £9,954
Total expenditure: £6,412

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 November 1986: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BARKSTON & SYSTON VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kathleen Patricia Beaumont Trustee 21 December 2021
None on record
Nigel Beaumont Trustee 21 December 2021
None on record
Ian Charles Cowley Trustee 15 January 2019
None on record
Karen Leslie Chevalier Trustee 15 January 2019
None on record
MARION STEWART Trustee 30 October 2012
None on record
PETER STEWART Trustee 24 October 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.05k £12.40k £18.16k £10.36k £9.95k
Total expenditure £11.06k £24.03k £5.32k £15.19k £6.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £9.67k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Barkston & Syston Village Hall
Main Road
Barkston
GRANTHAM
Lincolnshire
NG32 2NH
Phone:
07785976759