Trustees ABERGAVENNY BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1194889
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Michael Ian Orsmond Chair 01 September 2010
None on record
Martin Richard Hayward Trustee 19 March 2025
MANSE FOR THE MINISTER OF BETHANY BAPTIST CHAPEL
Received: On time
Petrus Johannes Eksteen Trustee 19 March 2025
MANSE FOR THE MINISTER OF BETHANY BAPTIST CHAPEL
Received: On time
Joanna Louise Nugent Trustee 19 March 2025
MANSE FOR THE MINISTER OF BETHANY BAPTIST CHAPEL
Received: On time
Rebecca Joy Robinson Trustee 19 March 2025
MANSE FOR THE MINISTER OF BETHANY BAPTIST CHAPEL
Received: On time
Katherine Kippax Trustee 20 March 2024
MANSE FOR THE MINISTER OF BETHANY BAPTIST CHAPEL
Received: On time
Anne Irene Wilde Trustee 17 March 2021
MANSE FOR THE MINISTER OF BETHANY BAPTIST CHAPEL
Received: On time
Mary ANDERSON Trustee 01 September 2008
MANSE FOR THE MINISTER OF BETHANY BAPTIST CHAPEL
Received: On time