GRACE CHURCH SHREWSBURY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are passionate about Jesus and showing His love to others. All are welcome at our church, no matter who you are and what circumstances. Everything we do at Grace Church is built on the foundation of prayer. We meet at 10:30am every Sunday at the Harlescott Grange Community Hub, Kynaston Road, Harlescott, Shrewsbury, SY1 3JR. There is plenty of parking and disabled access. We also meet mid-week.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Shropshire
Governance
- 14 June 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul David Wyatt | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Terence Roy Hotchkiss | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|||||
GEORGE ANDREW FAICHNEY | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Paul Hall | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Ruth Hotchkiss | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH MAJELLA O'DWYER | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Denise Fletcher | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.11k | £75.54k | £78.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.35k | £53.80k | £75.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS AND PRACTICES IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN SHREWSBURY AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITY WORK OF THE CHARITY. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CLO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 2011.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Sharpstones Lane
Bayston Hill
SHREWSBURY
SY3 0AN
- Phone:
- 07712628336
- Email:
- terry.hotchkiss@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window