Accounts and annual returns GLOBAL EVANGELISTIC OUTREACH

Charity number: 518106
Charity reporting is overdue by 128 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 February 2024 04 March 2025 65 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 128 days
Annual return 28 February 2023 04 April 2024 98 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2022 31 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 17 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 13 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required