UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE IN COVENTRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of middle aged and elderly people in Coventry and its surrounding locality.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Coventry City
Governance
- 12 November 1986: Standard registration
- COVENTRY U3A (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Elspeth Beidas | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philipa Richings | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Pearce | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Adamson | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Derek James Medcraft | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Clarke | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judith Wilkinson | Trustee | 02 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Rouse | Trustee | 31 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jenifer Watson | Trustee | 06 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.72k | £5.14k | £4.40k | £7.86k | £5.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.16k | £3.17k | £1.35k | £7.54k | £6.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 June 2024 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 FEBRUAY 1986. AS AMENDED 25 NOVEMBER 1987 AND 22 JANUARY 1992.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE GROUP ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF MIDDLE AGED AND ELDERLY PEOPLE IN COVENTRY AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Area of benefit
COVENTRY AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
68 GARTH CRESCENT
BINLEY
COVENTRY
CV3 2PQ
- Phone:
- 02476459471
- Email:
- treasu3a@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window