Trustees UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE IN COVENTRY
Charity Number: 518108

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Elspeth Beidas | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philipa Richings | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Pearce | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Adamson | Trustee | 06 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Derek James Medcraft | Trustee | 08 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Clarke | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Judith Wilkinson | Trustee | 02 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Robert Rouse | Trustee | 31 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jenifer Watson | Trustee | 06 May 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.