RUGBY GYMNASTICS CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rugby Gymnastics Club is a long established Gymnastics Club in Warwickshire, which is dedicated to training young gymnasts, both boys and girls of all levels of ability from pre-school through Recreational to Elite standard and competitive squads.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2021
Total income includes £26,500 from 5 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 20 October 1986: Standard registration
- 02 September 2022: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 02 September 2022: Funds transferred to 1197184 RUGBY GYMNASTICS CLUB
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £305.78k | £328.50k | £332.61k | £312.73k | £290.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £302.42k | £327.85k | £336.34k | £277.09k | £265.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £6.00k | N/A | N/A | £2.00k | £26.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 25 November 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 25 November 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 25 November 2019 | 118 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | 16 October 2019 | 78 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 APRIL 1983 AS AMENDED 3 OCTOBER 1986, 23 OCTOBER 2003 AND 16 OCTOBER 2008.
Charitable objects
TO HELP AND EDUCATE CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS IN RUGBY AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT THROUGH PARTICIPATION IN GYMNASTIC SO TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES THAT THEY MAY BE HELPED TO GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
RUGBY AND SURROUNDING DISTRICT.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window