Accounts and annual returns LOVE BURLEY

Charity number: 1196085
Charity reporting is up to date (189 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 08 February 2025 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 08 May 2025 189 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 July 2024 252 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 09 July 2024 252 days late Download Open in new window