EXMOUTH AMATEUR BOXING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EABC is a local boxing club which provides boxing coaching in a small, well equipped gym in the town. We have six coaches to cover skills, fitness and stamina. We also provide advice on diet and nutrition. We have links with local primary schools and Exmouth College and receive referrals from them for young people experiencing difficulties in their lives who would benefit for what we offer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 13 August 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Neil Ferreday | Chair | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rob Toomey MBE | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Endicott | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janine Ashworth-Endicott | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Brendan Christopher Lee M.A. | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Walkey | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.69k | £8.68k | £7.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.19k | £4.54k | £4.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 03 June 2024 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 03 June 2024 | 119 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 13 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN EXMOUTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES TO ENABLE PARTICIPATION IN THE SPORT OF AMATEUR BOXING. (FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS CLAUSE “FACILITIES” MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT, ACCESS TO COACHING AND ORGANISING SPORTING ACTIVITIES).
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 NEW NORTH ROAD
EXMOUTH
EX8 1RU
- Phone:
- 01395744078
- Email:
- brendanclee@icloud.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window