PROJECT GALGO

Charity Number: 1197487
Charity reporting is up to date (34 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are a UK based, volunteer led, not-for-profit animal welfare rescue organisation dedicated to rescue, rehabilitation and re-homing of Galgos and Podencos (Spanish sighthounds) and Salukis who are in need of care and protection, in particular by rescue, rehabilitation and re-homing.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024

Total income: £111,399
Total expenditure: £113,895

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Scotland
  • Spain

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 January 2022: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Helena Jackson Chair 12 January 2022
None on record
CAMILLA BEARDSMORE Trustee 12 January 2022
None on record
Pennie Clayton Trustee 12 January 2022
None on record
Paul Jackson Trustee 12 January 2022
None on record
Grace Filmer Trustee 12 January 2022
None on record
Samantha Walker-Arends Trustee 12 January 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2023 01/04/2024
Total gross income £54.77k £111.40k
Total expenditure £43.19k £113.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 01 April 2024 21 February 2025 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2024 07 March 2025 34 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2023 30 May 2024 119 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 30 May 2024 119 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
4 KINGSMEAD COTTAGES
BARLING ROAD
BARLING MAGNA
SOUTHEND-ON-SEA
SS3 0NB
Phone:
07802553507