Landscape Water Carbon Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a grant-making trust, which gives grants to landscape projects which store carbon, include forest garden / food forest and water-based projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Andorra
- Argentina
- Austria
- Belgium
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Bulgaria
- Canada
- Chile
- Croatia
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Estonia
- Finland
- France
- Greece
- Guernsey
- Hungary
- India
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Italy
- Jersey
- Latvia
- Liechtenstein
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Malta
- Netherlands
- Norway
- Poland
- Portugal
- Romania
- Scotland
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Spain
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 23 August 2021: CIO registration
- FOOD FOREST FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Minni Jain | Chair | 23 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Neil Franses | Trustee | 03 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN CRAWFORD | Trustee | 23 August 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125 | £60 | £1.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 June 2024 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 19 June 2024 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Aug 2021 as amended on 20 Feb 2025
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PRESERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT USING METHODS THAT SEQUESTRATE CARBON FROM THE ATMOSPHERE INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) AGROFORESTRY, FOREST GARDENS AND FOOD FORESTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 HUNTERS MOON
DARTINGTON
TOTNES
TQ9 6JT
- Phone:
- 01803840776
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window