THE ABILITIES IN ME FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to promote inclusivity and raise awareness of many conditions through our children's book series. We run events including family fun days, school workshops and book reading activities. We donate equipment and books to schools, families and hospitals alongside awarding grants to families in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Canada
- New Zealand
- United States
Governance
- 17 February 2022: CIO registration
- THE ABILITIES IN ME BOOK SERIES (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maxwell Keir | Chair | 31 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Hawkins | Trustee | 31 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Emma Lusty | Trustee | 31 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Lusty | Trustee | 31 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.83k | £78.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.63k | £72.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
1. ADVANCING EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF CHILDREN IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO DISABILITIES AND INCLUSION THROUGH ‘THE ABILITIES INCLUSIVE WORKSHOP TRAINING’ AND ‘SCHOOL VISITS’ 2. RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN WITH A DISABILITY AND SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS BY CREATING AN INCLUSIVE ‘SAFE SPACE’ THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SENSORY ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SENSORY ROOM MAKEOVERS TO MAINSTREAM EDUCATIONAL ENVIRONMENTS. 3. TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF CHILDREN WITH DISABILITIES BY PROVIDING SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE TO HELP THEM UNDERSTAND THEIR CONDITION OR DIAGNOSIS AND ASSISTING FAMILIES WITH SUPPORT NETWORKS 4. TO ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, INCLUDING RAISING FUNDS, PROVIDING GRANTS, DONATING BOOKS INTO HOSPITAL SETTINGS AND SPECIALIST EQUIPMENT TO FAMILIES IN NEED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Cromwell Road
STEVENAGE
Hertfordshire
SG2 9HT
- Phone:
- 07548358110
- Email:
- info@theabilitiesinme.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window