SHAPING PORTSMOUTH FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bringing together Education and Community, The Shaping Portsmouth Foundation has been founded to provide dedicated support and advice to the education and community sectors and to also give us access to grants from specific organisations in this sector.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 20 January 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hasmukh Patel | Trustee | 05 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sam Singleton | Trustee | 19 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Patricia Lee | Trustee | 15 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 July 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 12 July 2023 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 20 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE AGED 11 TO 16 YEARS OF AGE THROUGH THE PROVISION EMPLOYABILITY TRAINING, MENTORING, CAREERS ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shaping Portsmouth
Floor U2
Guildhall
Guildhall Square
PORTSMOUTH
- Phone:
- 07763200273
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window