SARASWATI CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity helps disabled people in England and India
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England
- India
Governance
- 03 December 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NITESH SOMANI | Chair | 02 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Priti Somani | Trustee | 02 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dipti Soni | Trustee | 02 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Anjana Sidpara | Trustee | 02 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/02/2023 | 01/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.24k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.22k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 February 2024 | 02 December 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 173 days | |
Annual return | 01 February 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 February 2023 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 03 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE LIVING IN THE COUNTRIES WE WORK IN, BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES. 2.THE RELIEF OF THE SICK-POOR LIVING IN COUNTRIES WE WORK IN, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES. 3.THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY IN THE COUNTRIES WE WORK IN, BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. 4. THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY OR FINANCIAL HARDSHIP ANYWHERE IN THE SPECIFIED COUNTRIES BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, HEALTHCARE PROJECTS AND ALL THE NECESSARY SUPPORT DESIGNED TO ENABLE INDIVIDUALS TO GENERATE A SUSTAINABLE INCOME AND BE SELF-SUFFICIENT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Stoctone Road
Oadby
LEICESTER
LE2 2GT
- Phone:
- 07958343901
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window