THE ROTHERHAM MINSTER DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting fundraising for the restoration and repair of Rotherham Minster building internally and externally.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Rotherham
Governance
- 24 October 1986: Standard registration
- THE ROTHERHAM PARISH CHURCH DEVELOPMENT TRUST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER DAVID HAMBY | Chair | 27 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Michael John Smith | Trustee | 27 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Philip John Batchford | Trustee | 01 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Earl Richard Scarborough | Trustee | 01 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr ROBERT JOHN GILES BLOOMER OBE D.L | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER JOHN CLIFFORD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CATH COPP | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
VALERIE ANN BRENNAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE HICKS | Trustee |
|
||||||
MRS DOREEN CLIFFORD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.66k | £415 | £5.84k | £4.09k | £54.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.81k | £1.81k | £0 | £2.60k | £34.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | Download Open in new window | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 18/09/1986 AS AMENDED ON 14/05/2013
Charitable objects
TO RESTORE DEVELOP IMPROVE REPAIR AND MAINTAIN THE PARISH CHURCH OF ALL SAINTS ROTHERHAM IN THE DIOCESE OF SHEFFIELD ITS FURNITURE AND ORNAMENTS AND ECCLESIASTICAL PROPERTY CONNECTED THEREWITH (INCLUDING THE CHAPEL OF OUR LADY OF ROTHERHAM BRIDGE).
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, ROTHERHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 LANE END ROAD
ROTHERHAM
S60 3HR
- Phone:
- 01709531843
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window