PROGHIST LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Publisher of novice-friendly, peer-reviewed, open access tutorials that help humanists learn a wide range of digital tools, techniques, and workflows to facilitate research and teaching.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Brazil
- Canada
- Chile
- Colombia
- France
- Germany
- Mexico
- Portugal
- Switzerland
- United States
Governance
- 21 September 2021: Standard registration
- PROGRAMMING HISTORIAN (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr James Baker | Chair | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jennifer Isasi | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adam Farquhar | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|||||
Dr Adam Crymble | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anna-Maria Sichani | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Riva Quiroga | Trustee | 21 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.40k | £38.08k | £52.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.83k | £35.24k | £51.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 27 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 27 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 SEP 2019 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13 SEP 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECT “OBJECT” IS SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC IN THE HUMANITIES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM APPROPRIATE, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO EDUCATIONAL TUTORIALS, ARTICLES AND RESEARCH IN ALL ASPECTS OF THAT SUBJECT AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS INTO THE PUBLIC DOMAIN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o West and Berry
Nile House
Nile Street
Brighton
BN1 1HW
- Phone:
- 01273006106
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window