THE HOYLAND CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To spread the gospel throughout Hoyland and surrounding areas. To provide services for worship and prayer in the building and outside as appropriate in the community. To welcome all who genuinely want to seek God. To provide charitable practises and/or finances for ministry in this country or others as is appropriate. To provide time and resources deemed necessary for individuals or groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 October 1986: Standard registration
- HOYLAND CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER ANTHONY DOBSON SMITH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Shirley Rosemarie Howitt | Trustee | 28 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
John Jergas | Trustee | 04 December 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.31k | £5.85k | £5.69k | £10.92k | £13.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.66k | £4.17k | £5.07k | £11.15k | £7.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 09 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 08 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 11 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DEED 8 OCTOBER 1986
Charitable objects
TO ADVANE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN SOUTH YORKSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE AND TO ECUCATE MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC IN THE NEED FOR A REVIVAL OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN THE NEED AND VALUE OF PUBLIC AND PRIVATE PRAYER
Area of benefit
SOUTH YORKSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hoyland Christian Fellowship
Highcroft
Hoyland
BARNSLEY
South Yorkshire
S74 9AF
- Phone:
- 01226748683
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window