MYRTLE PARK FRIENDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We hold action days every two weeks on a Sunday morning, run by the trustees and open to members of the public to volunteer to help. This involves gardening, maintenance and litter picking. We open the Park Hub to visitors every Sunday afternoon to look at the displays and information about the park and to make use of the nature activities and resources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income includes £600 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bradford City
Governance
- 16 September 2021: CIO registration
- FRIENDS OF MYRTLE PARK (Working name)
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rosemary Sharp | Chair | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Petrie | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gaynor Smith | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Bennett | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Susan Joy Smith | Trustee | 16 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £11.26k | £6.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £10.63k | £5.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.19k | £600 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 18 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 18 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 16 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF BINGLEY, BRADFORD CITY (“THE AREA OF BENEFIT”), TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PRESERVATION, PROMOTION, SUPPORT, ASSISTANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF MYRTLE PARK, BINGLEY, BRADFORD CITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Unity Street North
BINGLEY
BD16 1EN
- Phone:
- 07753294849
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window