LOVING HANDS OUTREACH TEAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Loving Hands Outreach Team aims to prevent or relieve poverty, through the provision of essential foods and household goods to: *individuals/households in need *and/or other organisations working to relieve poverty. This will be carried out for individuals/households of any age, size, religion, ethnic or gender group, living within the local government Metropolitan area of Kirklees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kirklees
Governance
- 17 June 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louisa Weir | Chair | 17 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paula Jane Cutler | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Louise Poole | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Karen Margaret Wilson | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.79k | £36.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.71k | £24.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 17 Jun 2021 as amended on 20 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY, THROUGH PROVISION OF ESSENTIAL FOODS AND HOUSEHOLD GOODS TO: * INDIVIDUALS/ HOUSEHOLDS IN NEED *AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. THIS WILL BE CARRIED OUT WITH REFERENCE TO THE FOLLOWING CRITERIA: * FOR INDIVIDUALS/HOUSEHOLDS OR ANY AGE, SIZE, RELIGION, ETHNIC OR GENDER GROUP * IN ORDER TO BENEFIT, AN INDIVIDUAL/INDIVIDUALS IN A HOUSEHOLD SHOULD BE: IN POVERTY; OR -AT RISK OF BEING IN POVERTY. *INDIVIDUALS/HOUSEHOLDS SHOULD BE LIVING IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT METROPOLITAN AREA OF KIRKLEES
Contact information
- Address:
-
150 HIGH STREET
HANGING HEATON
BATLEY
WF17 6DW
- Phone:
- 07712440546
- Email:
- lhoutreacht@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window