SAGITTARII

Charity number: 1195397
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides facilities and coaching in the local community in the sport of archery.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £4,893
Total expenditure: £6,185

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Bournemouth
  • Dorset
  • Poole
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 05 August 2021: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David Michael Reynolds Chair 28 June 2022
None on record
Gillian Boyd Trustee 28 July 2024
None on record
Maureen Boyd Trustee 28 July 2024
None on record
Janice Marjorie Reynolds Trustee 17 April 2024
None on record
Joanne Kathryn Joss Trustee 17 April 2024
None on record
Paul Hamerston Trustee 25 September 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2022 01/04/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.50k £7.37k £4.89k
Total expenditure £4.24k £5.32k £6.19k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 05 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 05 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2023 12 February 2024 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2023 12 February 2024 11 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 01 April 2022 04 February 2023 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 01 April 2022 04 February 2023 3 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
c/o Sagittarii Secretary
11 Flaghead Road
Poole
Dorset
BH13 7JN
Phone:
07929195845