THE FREE METHODIST CHURCH, BARTLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a local church serving the local community. We seek to spread the good news of the gospel in this area and to support individuals and other Christian organizations in different parts of the world
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
34 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 06 November 1986: Standard registration
- CROWN LANE FREE METHODIST CHURCH (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN DAVID HOGARTH | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Derek William Rosendale | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Ian Kenneth Clarkson | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
James William Rosendale | Trustee | 08 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
MR ALAN CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.79k | £64.98k | £61.40k | £69.66k | £87.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £80.29k | £91.94k | £131.27k | £141.17k | £128.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 29 NOVEMBER 1984 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 27 MARCH 2000
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE THE FURTHERANCE IN BARTLE OF THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE FREE METHODIST CHURCH OF NORTH AMERICA IN MANNER PROVIDED FOR IN THE MODEL SCHEME.
Area of benefit
BARTLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
GODSON HOUSE FARM
CATFORTH
PRESTON
LANCASHIRE
PR4 0HE
- Phone:
- 01772690226
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window