NORWICH CANOE CLUB CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities of the Club are the provision of facilities for kayaking, canoeing and paracanoe from its base at Whitlingham Boathouse, Norwich. The Club's activities include all inclusive training and coaching for Sprint and Marathon flatwater racing, providing equipment where necessary for all ages, abilities with an additional focus upon the para canoe sector.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 15 February 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin John Anthony Matthews M.Phil | Chair | 19 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Matthew James Lodge | Trustee | 30 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Walker | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DENIS FRANKLAND | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Aaron Widdows | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £185.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £124.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 29 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 15 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF NORWICH AND PERSONS LIVING IN AND AROUND NORFOLK BY PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR KAYAKING, CANOEING AND PARACANOE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
NORWICH CANOE CLUB
WHITLINGHAM LANE
TROWSE
NORWICH
NR14 8TR
- Phone:
- 07999475452
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window