BRIDGWATER BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bridgwater Baptist Church was founded early in the 17th Century.We base our faith and practice on the Bible and the teaching of Jesus Christ. We practice believers baptism and communion is open to all. We are linked to the South Western Baptist Association and the Baptist Union. We also have links with mission workers in Nepal through BMS World Mission.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Somerset
Governance
- 16 June 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Monika Gergelova | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Annette Catherine Griffiths | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey John Thorne | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Davies | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Leslie Rawles | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janet Irene Biddiscombe | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.47k | £564.63k | £80.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.44k | £526.17k | £77.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £564.63k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £526.17k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 16 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSES OF THE CHURCH ARE:- THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRIDGWATER BAPTIST CHURCH
ST. MARY STREET
BRIDGWATER
SOMERSET
TA6 3EQ
- Phone:
- 01278425356
- Email:
- info@bridgwaterbaptist.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window