EXVAC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EXVAC is a children's charity that works to take children from socially and financially underprivileged backgrounds (eg: abused children, young carers, low-income families) away on holiday for a week. We run two week-long holidays, each for 16 children under the supervision of 8 leaders, incorporating a wide range of trips and activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 04 June 2021: CIO registration
- 12 July 2024: Funds received from 1088158 EXETER COLLEGE VACATION PROJECT
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carla Zoe Handford | Chair | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Alexander Green | Trustee | 11 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Phoebe Ellaby Mumby | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Henriette Elizabeth Topel | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Andrew Michael Augustine Allen | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tabitha Thornton-Swan | Trustee | 29 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £30 | £60 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £30 | £65 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 24 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 24 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 22 April 2023 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 25 June 2023 | 86 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 04 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN FROM THE OXFORD AREA WHO ARE IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO PROVIDE FREE HOLIDAYS FOR DEPRIVED CHILDREN FROM THE OXFORD AREA. THE CHILDREN ARE TO BE RECOMMENDED BY SOCIAL SERVICES AND/OR OTHER QUALIFIED ORGANISATIONS. THE CHILDREN SHOULD BE: I) IN REAL NEED DUE TO A STRESSFUL HOME SITUATION II) IN FAMILIES SO FINANCIALLY DEPRIVED THAT THE CHILDREN WOULD NOT OTHERWISE GET A HOLIDAY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
EXETER COLLEGE
TURL STREET
OXFORD
OX1 3DP
- Phone:
- 07711128150
- Email:
- exvacexec@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window