CATHOLICS FOR AIDS PREVENTION AND SUPPORT (CAPS) CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support for PLWH primarily in the UK. HIV Education, awareness and support for Faith communities and HIV sector organisations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £24,989 from 1 government contract(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
Governance
- 18 October 2021: CIO registration
- 24 January 2023: Funds received from 1095756 CATHOLICS FOR AIDS PREVENTION AND SUPPORT (CAPS)
- POSITITVE CATHOLICS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LAZARUS MUNGURE | Chair | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
MARIAM YUSUF | Trustee | 18 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Matilda Makombe MA | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shiellah Mushunje | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Christie-Davies | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Adela Butetsi Senkubuge | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tyrone Allee | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOHN THORNHILL | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.90k | £126.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.62k | £101.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £10.50k | £24.99k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 18 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: * TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONGST THOSE SUFFERING AS A RESULT OF HIV/AIDS, * TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT HUMAN HEALTH BY PROVIDING INFORMATION ON HIV/AIDS, AND * TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH, CONSISTENT WITH ITS LIVING TRADITIONS, INCLUDING SACRED SCRIPTURE AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF DOCTRINE OF THE SAME CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 THRING HOUSE
STOCKWELL ROAD
LONDON
SW9 9EU
- Phone:
- 07505608655
- Email:
- info@caps-uk.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window