THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD, WINNERS WORLD PARISH LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) The advancement of Christian faith in United Kingdom and worldwide in accordance with the doctrines set out in the statement of faith contained in the schedule. 2) The prevention or relief of poverty throughout England by providing items and services to individuals in need and signposting to relevant services to prevent or relieve poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 June 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ebenezer BARIKPOAR | Chair | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
BOLAJI AJALARURU | Trustee | 13 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kolawole Samuel IGE | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bukola Igbekele | Trustee | 21 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Emmanuel EHIWE | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.92k | £80.45k | £101.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.12k | £35.61k | £46.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 29 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 JAN 2020
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHRISTIAN FAITH IN UNITED KINGDOM AND WORLDWIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE. 2) THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY THROUGHOUT ENGLAND BY PROVIDING ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND SIGNPOSTING TO RELEVANT SERVICES TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
63 WARDLOW ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B7 4JH
- Phone:
- 07958157683
- Email:
- kigbekele@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window