WINCHESTER YOUTH COUNSELLING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Winchester Youth Counselling (WYC) provides counselling and other therapeutic activities to young people aged 11-25 experiencing mental health issues in the District of Winchester.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £32,466 from 1 government contract(s) and £7,480 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Hampshire
Governance
- 22 July 2021: CIO registration
- 07 February 2023: Funds received from 1093429 WINCHESTER YOUTH COUNSELLING
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Ann Todd | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dason Bodilly | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Flynn | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susannah Claire Webber | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Robin Newberry | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael David Mander | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirsteen Hook | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Thursten Clements | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Louise Montagu | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £274.83k | £330.59k | £374.23k | |
|
Total expenditure | £250.58k | £369.58k | £373.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £32.47k | |
|
Income from government grants | £62.65k | £37.56k | £7.48k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 22 Jul 2021 as amended on 06 Feb 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE GOOD MENTAL HEALTH AND WELLBEING AMONG PEOPLE AGED BETWEEN 11 AND 25 YEARS OF AGE WHO ARE RESIDENT IN HAMPSHIRE BY PROVIDING COUNSELLING AND THERAPEUTIC INTERVENTIONS TO YOUNG PEOPLE, SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES, AND HELP THEM GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND AS MEMBERS OF SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Winchester Youth Counselling
The Winchester Centre
68 St. Georges Street
WINCHESTER
Hampshire
SO23 8AH
- Phone:
- 01962820444
- Email:
- admin@winchyc.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window