WINCHCOMBE COMMUNITY ALLOTMENTS AND ORCHARD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Managing the provision of community allotments and an orchard for the benefit of the Winchcombe community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 18 October 2021: CIO registration
- WINCHCOMBE CAO (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tom de la Rosa C.WEM | Chair | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Robert Kevin Cam | Trustee | 09 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Anne Davies | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Louise Nicholls | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Amy Verey | Trustee | 18 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.62k | £9.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.39k | £9.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.50k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 09 March 2024 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 09 March 2024 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 18 Oct 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO: (1) TO BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF WINCHCOMBE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE GROWING FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. (2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY PROMOTING SUSTAINABLE GROWING PRACTICES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
78 NORTH STREET
WINCHCOMBE
CHELTENHAM
GL54 5PS
- Phone:
- 07840490663
- Email:
- winchcombecao@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window