MERCIFUL DEEDS LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention or relief of poverty or financial hardship in UK and abroad. Relief of poverty through food programme for the needy. Assisting in the provision of education and healthcare projects and all the necessary support designed to enable individuals to generate a sustainable income and be self-sufficient by making grants to charitable and non-governmental organisations and individuals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Pakistan
Governance
- 23 November 2021: Standard registration
- HAND OF MERCY (INTERNATIONAL) LTD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NOUMAN PERVEZ | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Humayun Shahzad | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
ZAINAB SHAHZAD | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | 30/11/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.80k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 05 December 2024 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 04 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30 NOV 2020 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 09 NOV 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 16 NOV 2021
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PROVISION OF BASIC FOOD PACKAGES AND REGULAR MEALS TO CHILDREN, FAMILIES, AND COMMUNITIES IN CRISIS; 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION BY PROVIDING FUNDING AND SUPPORT TO SCHOOLS AND TEACHERS TO HELP THEM RAISE ATTAINMENT FOR CHILDREN FROM LOW INCOME HOMES; AND 3. THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BY PROVIDING SUPPORT TO REMOTE AREAS WHO LACK THE NECESSARY EQUIPMENT IN TIMES OF EMERGENCY, SUPPORTING VARIOUS HEALTHCARE FACILITIES AND HELPING WITH THE CONSTRUCTION AND REHABILITATION OF MEDICAL CLINICS AND THE PROVISION OF DIAGNOSTIC CENTRES, INCLUDING EYE SURGERIES AND FREE BLOOD TRANSFUSION FOR CHILDREN WITH THALASSEMIA THROUGH THE MOBILE HEALTH UNITS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
16
CRANBROOK ROAD
ILFORD
IG1 4DL
- Phone:
- 07507555777
- Email:
- info@mercifuldeeds.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window