Accounts and annual returns MUSICAL THEATRE STAFFORD

Charity Number: 1196249
Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 27 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 27 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 02 June 2022 02 July 2023 91 days late
Accounts and TAR 02 June 2022 02 July 2023 91 days late Download Open in new window