Trustees MUSICAL THEATRE STAFFORD
Charity number: 1196249

Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Jayne Wattley | Chair | 20 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Stephenson | Trustee | 05 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Jayne Nicholls | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Michelle Rodi | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Rose Morris | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Matthews | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
LAURA RIDDELL | Trustee | 04 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Phizacklea | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bella Dalby | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Smith | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Travers | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Craig Chesters | Trustee | 25 July 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.