WOODLEIGH IMPACT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Objects of the Charity include the prevention and relief of poverty and the conservation, protection and improvement of the physical and natural environment including by raising awareness of the impact of climate change.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 September 2021: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Clarke | Chair | 10 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Louise Dorothy Clarke | Trustee | 10 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Hendrika Clarke | Trustee | 10 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £814.02k | £497.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £188.20k | £174.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £813.02k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £998 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £188.20k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £36.22k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £151.98k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 JUL 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES (ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES) AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME, IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY): 3.1 TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT, INCLUDING BY RAISING AWARENESS OF THE IMPACT OF CLIMATE CHANGE AND BY MAKING GRANTS TO CHARITIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO CONSERVE, PROTECT AND IMPROVE THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT; 3.2 FOR THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING GRANTS AND SUPPORT TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
114 OTLEY ROAD
GUISELEY
LEEDS
LS20 8LZ
- Phone:
- 01943262626
- Email:
- info@woodleigh-impact.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window