CHRISTIAN CONGREGATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Advancement of Christian Faith in accordance with the articles of faith, spreading the gospel of our Lord Jesus Christ as our head, and the Holy Spirit as our guide
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 September 2021: CIO registration
- 07 February 2025: Funds received from 1117274 CHRISTIAN CONGREGATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM
- CHRISTIAN CONGREGATION IN THE UK (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Silvano Carlos Duarte | Chair | 13 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Marcelo Hirosh Spina | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Luiz Henrique Matiazzi | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
FABRICIO MELO DE ALMEIDA | Trustee | 13 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Tharsis Andre Guido | Trustee | 13 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Davi De Franca Cintra | Trustee | 13 November 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £189.81k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £189.81k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 07 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 07 May 2025 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 09 Sep 2021 as amended on 07 Feb 2025
Charitable objects
3.1. THE PURPOSES OF THE CCUK ARE: 3.1.1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ARTICLES OF FAITH, SPREADING THE GOSPEL OF OUR LORD JESUS CHRIST, THE LOVE OF GOD, HAVING JESUS CHRIST AS OUR HEAD, AND THE HOLY SPIRIT AS OUR GUIDE; AND 3.1.2. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL, IN THE OPINION OF THE CHARITY TRUSTEES, PUT INTO PRACTICE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ARTICLES OF FAITH, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND SICKNESS; PROVIDED THAT THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH PURPOSES MUST BE UNDERTAKEN IN A MANNER THAT IS CONSISTENT WITH THE RULES AS MAY BE ADOPTED AND AMENDED BY THE CCUK FROM TIME TO TIME INCLUDING ANY DOCTRINAL DISTINCTIVES AND ETHICAL STATEMENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christian Congregation in the UK
Sandford Gate
East Business Centre n37
Sandy Lane West
OXFORD
OX4 6LB
- Phone:
- 07412700084
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window