HERTS INCLUSIVE SPORTS INITIATIVE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Herts Inclusive Sports Initiative is a charity that assists sports clubs and other organised groups based in Hertfordshire and Essex and who provide activities for people with a disability by awarding financial grants through an application process. Individuals can also apply for financial support e.g. coach education or to support an athlete to attend a national or international competition.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Essex
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 16 June 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil David Ward BA, MEd | Chair | 14 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Sandra King | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Warrington | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.80k | £995 | £995 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.61k | £2.83k | £2.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 May 2024 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 May 2024 | 91 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FALLING UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING: - TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. - TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION. - TO RELIEVE THE NEED OF WITH A LEARNING, PHYSICAL OR SENSORY DISABILITY, EMOTIONAL BEHAVIOUR OR MENTAL HEALTH BY PROVIDING ACCESS TO LOCAL PROGRAMMES AND GROUPS WITHIN THEIR LOCAL COMMUNITY. - TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE ‘SOCIALLY EXCLUDED’ MEANS BEING EXCLUDED FROM SOCIETY, OR PARTS OF SOCIETY, AS A RESULT OF ONE OF MORE OF THE FOLLOWING FACTORS: UNEMPLOYMENT; FINANCIAL HARDSHIP; YOUTH OR OLD AGE; ILL HEALTH (PHYSICAL OR MENTAL); SUBSTANCE ABUSE OR DEPENDENCY INCLUDING ALCOHOL AND DRUGS; DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF SEX, RACE, DISABILITY, ETHNIC ORIGIN, RELIGION, BELIEF, CREED, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR GENDER RE-ASSIGNMENT; POOR EDUCATIONAL OR SKILLS ATTAINMENT; RELATIONSHIP AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN; POOR HOUSING (THAT IS HOUSING THAT DOES NOT MEET BASIC HABITABLE STANDARDS; CRIME (EITHER AS A VICTIM OF CRIME OR AS AN OFFENDER REHABILITATING INTO SOCIETY). - ADVANCING EDUCATION (INCLUDING EDUCATION, TRAINING AND DEVELOPMENT IN THE AREA OF LEADERSHIP AND SPORTS COACHING). - PROMOTING VOLUNTEERING (WHERE TO DO SO FURTHERS A CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES). - PROMOTING EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF GENDER, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY OR OF RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Amwell View School
Stanstead Abbotts
Ware
SG12 8EH
- Phone:
- 07729892729
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window