Financial history SUPERINTENDENT MINISTER'S TRUST

Charity number: 518173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £220.38k £246.87k £247.94k £282.66k £273.33k
Total expenditure £268.44k £258.94k £249.29k £290.20k £442.55k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A