HUGHES EDUCATION CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity supports those in education. This is carried out through the provision of grants and materials to people in full time education and organisations which support those in full time education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Philippines
Governance
- 16 June 2021: CIO registration
- Action for Knowledge (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Luke Edward Hughes | Chair | 14 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rizalinda Marcial Hughes | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.19k | £16.88k | £16.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.63k | £18.81k | £9.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 01 May 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 01 May 2025 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 10 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 10 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 01 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 01 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE IN FULL TIME EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES SEE FIT, INCLUDING BY: 1. AWARDING TO SUCH PERSONS GRANTS OR THE PROVISION OF MATERIALS TO ENABLE THEM TO ATTEND UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTIONS OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION. 2. PROVISION OF GRANTS, EQUIPMENT OR MATERIALS TO ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING FULL TIME EDUCATION. 3. SUPPORTING AND ENABLING THE CO-ORDINATION AND CO-OPERATION OF EDUCATIONAL ORGANISATIONS IN DIFFERENT GEOGRAPHICAL AREAS WITH DIFFERENT SOCIO-ECONOMICAL BACKGROUNDS. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HORAM FLAT FARM
CHIDDINGLY ROAD
HORAM
HORAM FLAT FARM
CHIDDINGLY ROAD
TN21 0JL
- Phone:
- 07771868225
- Email:
- luke@hughescharity.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window