Accounts and annual returns CELESTIAL CHURCH OF CHRIST FOUNDERS PARISH 2

Charity number: 1194914
Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 March 2024 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 09 March 2024 38 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window