Accounts and annual returns DORSET MAMMAL GROUP

Charity number: 1196394
Charity reporting is overdue by 21 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 16 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 21 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 26 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 26 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 26 July 2023 87 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 26 July 2023 87 days late Download Open in new window