Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST MARY & ST NICOLAS SPALDING

Charity Number: 518187
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not submitted
Annual return 05 April 2022 07 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 06 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 25 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 11 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required