CLASS PEOPLE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the CIO are too advance in life and relieve the charitable needs of young people up to the age of 16. Living in South West Region and to develop their capabilities that they may grow to full maturity as individulas and members of society, including (but without limitation) by the provision of grants/bursaries of other payments to such beneficiaries or to educational institutions.
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Gloucestershire
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 23 August 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lynis Ann Bassett | Chair | 23 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Clive Thomas | Trustee | 23 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Guest | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 29 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 394 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 394 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 760 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 760 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 23 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE CHARITABLE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 18 SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR CAPABILITIES THAT THEY MAY GROW TO FULL MATURITY AS INDIVIDUALS AND MEMBERS OF SOCIETY, INCLUDING (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, BURSARIES OR OTHER PAYMENTS TO SUCH BENEFICIARIES OR TO EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS ATTENDED BY SUCH BENEFICIARIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Class Peopl
2 Manor Park Business Centre
Mackenzie Way,Swindon Village
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL51 9TX
- Phone:
- 01242 898124
- Email:
- lynis@classpeople.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window