DARLINGTON HARRIERS & ATHLETICS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our objects are the advancement of, on promotion of community participation in, the amateur sport of athletics for the benefits of the inhabitants of Darlington and surrounding areas for the public benefit by the provision of facilities for participating in such sport, coaching in respect of such sport, and assistance with coaching and leadership qualifications, and support and assistance.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Darlington
Governance
- 26 October 2021: Standard registration
- DHAC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lesley Carol Miller | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Bevan | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Nigel David Orr | Trustee | 20 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2022 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £44.95k | £34.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £45.48k | £29.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 15 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20 APR 2021
Charitable objects
1. THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ('OBJECTS') ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE ADVANCEMENT OF, AND PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN, THE AMATEUR SPORTS OF ATHLETICS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF DARLINGTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PROVISION OF OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF: 1.1. FACILITIES FOR PARTICIPATING IN SUCH SPORT; 1.2 COACHING IN RESPECT OF SUCH SPORT, AND ASSISTANCE WITH COACHING AND LEADERSHIP QUALIFICATIONS; AND 1.3. SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE FOR BENEFICIARIES WHO CHOOSE TO COMPETE IN SUCH SPORT IN REGIONAL AND NATIONAL COMPETITIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 PENNINE CLOSE
DARLINGTON
DL3 9YA
- Phone:
- 07458125721
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window