NAPOLEONIC & REVOLUTIONARY WAR GRAVES CHARITY

Charity number: 1196849
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Restore the graves of members of the armed services and auxiliary forces who served at any point between 1775 and 1815, irrespective of nationality, so that they can become sites of memory for the public. Bury veterans from the period who are disinterred. Educate the public about the experiences of those who served in this period

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £6,782
Total expenditure: £7,267

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Abu Dhabi
  • Afghanistan
  • Ajman
  • Akrotiri
  • Aland Islands
  • Albania
  • Algeria
  • American Samoa
  • Andorra
  • Angola
  • Anguilla
  • Antarctica
  • Antigua And Barbuda
  • Argentina
  • Armenia
  • Aruba
  • Ascension
  • Australia
  • Austria
  • Azerbaijan
  • Bahrain
  • Baker Island
  • Bangladesh
  • Barbados
  • Belarus
  • Belgium
  • Belize
  • Benin
  • Bermuda
  • Bhutan
  • Bolivia
  • Bonaire
  • Bosnia And Herzegovina
  • Botswana
  • Bouvet Island
  • Brazil
  • British Antarctic Territory
  • British Indian Ocean Territory
  • British Virgin Islands
  • Brunei
  • Bulgaria
  • Burkina Faso
  • Burma
  • Burundi
  • Cambodia
  • Cameroon
  • Canada
  • Cape Verde
  • Cayman Islands
  • Central African Republic
  • Ceuta
  • Chad
  • Chile
  • China
  • Christmas Island
  • Cocos (KEELING) ISLANDS
  • Colombia
  • Comoros
  • Congo
  • Congo (Democratic Republic)
  • Cook Islands
  • Costa Rica
  • Croatia
  • Cuba
  • Cyprus
  • Czech Republic
  • Denmark
  • Dhekelia
  • Djibouti
  • Dominica
  • Dominican Republic
  • Dubai
  • Easter Island
  • East Timor
  • Ecuador
  • Egypt
  • El Salvador
  • Equatorial Guinea
  • Eritrea
  • Estonia
  • Eswatini
  • Ethiopia
  • Falkland Islands
  • Faroe Islands
  • Fiji
  • Finland
  • France
  • French Guiana
  • French Polynesia
  • French Southern Territories
  • Fujairah
  • Gabon
  • Georgia
  • Germany
  • Ghana
  • Gibraltar
  • Greece
  • Greenland
  • Grenada
  • Guadeloupe
  • Guam
  • Guatemala
  • Guernsey
  • Guinea
  • Guinea-bissau
  • Guyana
  • Haiti
  • Heard Island And Mcdonald Islands
  • Honduras
  • Hong Kong
  • Howland Island
  • Hungary
  • Iceland
  • India
  • Indonesia
  • Iran
  • Iraq
  • Ireland
  • Isle Of Man
  • Israel
  • Italy
  • Ivory Coast
  • Jamaica
  • Japan
  • Jarvis Island
  • Jersey
  • Johnston Atoll
  • Jordan
  • Kazakhstan
  • Kenya
  • Kingman Reef
  • Kiribati
  • Kosovo
  • Kuwait
  • Kyrgyzstan
  • Laos
  • Latvia
  • Lebanon
  • Lesotho
  • Liberia
  • Libya
  • Liechtenstein
  • Lithuania
  • Luxembourg
  • Macau
  • Macedonia
  • Madagascar
  • Malawi
  • Malaysia
  • Maldives
  • Mali
  • Malta
  • Marshall Islands
  • Martinique
  • Mauritania
  • Mauritius
  • Mayotte
  • Melilla
  • Mexico
  • Micronesia
  • Midway Islands
  • Moldova
  • Monaco
  • Mongolia
  • Montenegro
  • Montserrat
  • Morocco
  • Mozambique
  • Namibia
  • Nauru
  • Navassa Island
  • Nepal
  • Netherlands
  • New Caledonia
  • New Zealand
  • Nicaragua
  • Niger
  • Nigeria
  • Niue
  • Norfolk Island
  • Northern Ireland
  • Northern Mariana Islands
  • North Korea
  • Norway
  • Occupied Palestinian Territories
  • Oman
  • Pakistan
  • Palau
  • Palmyra Atoll
  • Panama
  • Papua New Guinea
  • Paraguay
  • Peru
  • Philippines
  • Pitcairn, Henderson, Ducie And Oeno Islands
  • Poland
  • Portugal
  • Puerto Rico
  • Qatar
  • Ras Al-khaimah
  • Réunion
  • Romania
  • Russia
  • Rwanda
  • Saba
  • Saint Barthélemy
  • Saint Helena
  • Saint-Martin
  • Saint Pierre And Miquelon
  • Saint Vincent
  • Samoa
  • San Marino
  • São Tomé And Principe
  • Saudi Arabia
  • Scotland
  • Senegal
  • Serbia
  • Seychelles
  • Sierra Leone
  • Singapore
  • Sint Eustatius
  • Sint Maarten
  • Slovakia
  • Slovenia
  • Solomon Islands
  • Somalia
  • South Africa
  • South Georgia And South Sandwich Islands
  • South Korea
  • South Sudan
  • Spain
  • Sri Lanka
  • St Kitts And Nevis
  • St Lucia
  • Sudan
  • Suriname
  • Svalbard And Jan Mayen
  • Sweden
  • Switzerland
  • Syria
  • Taiwan
  • Tajikistan
  • Tanzania
  • Thailand
  • The Bahamas
  • The Gambia
  • Togo
  • Tokelau
  • Tonga
  • Trinidad And Tobago
  • Tristan Da Cunha
  • Tunisia
  • Turkey
  • Turkmenistan
  • Turks And Caicos Islands
  • Tuvalu
  • Uganda
  • Ukraine
  • Umm Al-quwain
  • United Arab Emirates
  • United States
  • United States Virgin Islands
  • Uruguay
  • Uzbekistan
  • Vanuatu
  • Vatican City
  • Venezuela
  • Vietnam
  • Wake Island
  • Wallis And Futuna
  • Western Sahara
  • Yemen
  • Zambia
  • Zimbabwe

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 November 2021: CIO registration
Organisation type:
CIO
Other names:
  • NRWGC (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Graeme Callister Chair 05 September 2024
None on record
Dr Luke Reynolds Trustee 05 September 2024
None on record
Todd Campbell Trustee 05 September 2024
None on record
Dr Katie White Trustee 16 August 2021
None on record
Marcus Joseph Cribb MSc VR Trustee 03 May 2021
None on record
Peter Edmond Molloy Trustee 03 May 2021
None on record
Professor Beatrice de Graaf Trustee 03 May 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £17.03k £6.78k
Total expenditure £8.59k £7.27k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 19 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 15 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
33 CHURCH CLOSE
TOLLERTON
YORK
YO61 1QS
Phone:
07354480003