BUNDLES OF HOPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bundles of Hope runs a drop in twice a week on Mondays from 13:00 - 15:00 and on a Thursday from 09:30 -11:30. We provide a safe place for parents and carers to come with pre school children. Refreshments are supplied and pre loved clothes, nappies and other items are available. Working with Baby Basics we supply Moses baskets with supplies by referral from a health care professionals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 19 January 2022: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
June Farrant MA | Chair | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Margaret Allen | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Celia Helen Smith | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda June Twigg | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Kingsley Smith | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Christine Joyce Burton | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Miriam Ruth Stanyon | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Maud Radford | Trustee | 29 April 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.07k | £11.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.65k | £10.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 29 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Jan 2022
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY FOR THOSE WHO HAVE PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN, AND TO OFFER RELIEF AND SUPPORT FOR THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP THROUGH THE PROVISION OF USED CLOTHING, BEDDING, BABY FOOD, NAPPIES, AND ESSENTIAL TOILETRIES ETC. FOR FAMILIES IN LONG EATON AND THE SURROUNDING TOWNS AND VILLAGES TO A)BUILD A SENSE OF COMMUNITY FOR THOSE WHO ARE SOCIALLY ISOLATED. B)ENCOURAGE AN ETHOS OF DIGNITY AND RESPECT FOR ALL REGARDLESS OF ECONOMIC STATUS. C)PROVIDE THE OPPORTUNITY FOR MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY TO MEET AND SHARE RESOURCES TO PROMOTE SUSTAINABLE AND ENVIRONMENTALLY FRIENDLY PARENTING AND CARE, INCLUDING SIGN POSTING TO OTHER ORGANISATIONS AND RESOURCES (FOR EXAMPLE, LOCAL HEALTH VISITORS).
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bundles of Hope
MOHAN BUSINESS CENTRE
TAMWORTH ROAD
LONG EATON
NOTTINGHAM
NG10 1BE
- Phone:
- 07989722042
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window