THE TONY FARLEY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Tony Farley Foundation is a grant giving charity. We support existing students, and those wishing to become students, of The College of Practical Homeopathy in advancing health education. We do not accept unsolicited applications.
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England
Governance
- 14 December 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kristiana Thomas | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zohar Marer | Trustee | 13 December 2021 |
|
|||||
Lyndsey Booth | Trustee | 28 October 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 206 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 206 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 572 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 572 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 14 Dec 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS: TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED CURRENT OR PROSPECTIVE STUDENTS OF THE COLLEGE OF PRACTICAL HOMEOPATHY (UK), TO SUPPORT THEM IN THE COMPLETION OF THEIR EDUCATION AND PROFESSIONAL QUALIFICATION IN HOMEOPATHY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
27 Harness Close
WIMBORNE
Dorset
BH21 2UF
- Phone:
- 07539284238
- Email:
- ttfarleyfoundation@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window