GCH COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The CIO represents Grace Church Hackney, a Church of England congregation operating under a Bishop's Mission Order conducting worship services and acts of charitable faith in the local community and beyond in London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- City Of London
- Hackney
- Islington
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 09 July 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Jones | Chair | 08 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Barendina Geertruida van Essen | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Niamh Elizabeth MacLeod | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Murray Robert John Macaulay | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Guido Theodoor De Graaff | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 483 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 July 2024 | 533 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 17 July 2024 | 533 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 09 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CIO IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY PROVIDING WORSHIP, PRAYER AND CHRISTIAN TEACHING WITHIN THE ANGLICAN TRADITION AND WITHIN THE FRAMEWORKS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
37 Hemsworth Street
London
N1 5LF
- Phone:
- 07534669528
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window