CODICOTE PRE-SCHOOL (CIO)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Early-years education for Pre-school children in and around the village of Codicote, Hitchin
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £33,026 from 1 government contract(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- CODICOTE PRE-SCHOOL (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Frances Kathleen Maddex | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Selena Jackson | Trustee | 19 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
April Schofield / Knapper | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Grey | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kimbley Jo Cartwright | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Jones | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helen Allum | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Craig Bayliss | Trustee | 13 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.07k | £60.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £79.48k | £69.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £47.46k | £33.03k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 September 2024 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 20 September 2024 | 82 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 16 September 2024 | 444 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 16 September 2024 | 444 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 24 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY WORKS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT HAVING AS ITS OBJECTS THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) PROMOTING THEIR CARE AND SAFETY; (2) PROMOTING THEIR EDUCATION AND PROMOTING PARENTAL INVOLVEMENT; (3) PROMOTING THEIR HEALTH AND WELLBEING; (4) PROVIDING SERVICES TO SUPPORT THEM AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS; (5) PROVIDING SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS HOLDING MEMBERSHIP OF THE CIO; AND (6) FURTHERING THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Codicote Pre School
St. Giles Parish Centre
Bury Lane
Codicote
HITCHIN
SG4 8XX
- Phone:
- 07542285412
- Email:
- info@codicotepreschool.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window