Accounts and annual returns OPERATION FLORENCE

Charity number: 1196409
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 15 May 2024 08 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 15 May 2024 08 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 15 May 2023 18 August 2024 156 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 May 2023 18 August 2024 156 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 15 May 2022 19 March 2023 4 days late
Accounts and TAR 15 May 2022 19 March 2023 4 days late Download Open in new window