Accounts and annual returns ST MILBURGA LODGE NO 1120 BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 518217
Charity reporting is overdue by 1290 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 194 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 194 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 560 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 560 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 925 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 925 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1290 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1290 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 05 April 2021 156 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required