Health Sciences University Students' Union

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Activities to support the student experience such as social and sporting events, academic enhancement and student advocacy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- Southwark
Governance
- 14 December 2021: Standard registration
- AECC STUDENTS' UNION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angelina Thomas | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Belegni | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Isobel Mitchell | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Kilkenny-Browne | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Sullivan MChiro | Trustee | 05 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £168.57k | £143.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £158.08k | £155.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 03 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 03 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 19 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 MAR 2021 AS AMENDED ON 25 OCT 2021 as amended on 10 Oct 2024 as amended on 10 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
THE UNION'S OBJECTS ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AT AECC UNIVERSITY COLLEGE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: 3.1 PROMOTING THE INTERESTS AND WELFARE OF STUDENTS AT AECC UNIVERSITY COLLEGE DURING THEIR COURSE OF STUDY AND REPRESENTING, SUPPORTING AND ADVISING STUDENTS; 3.2 BEING THE RECOGNISED REPRESENTATIVE CHANNEL BETWEEN STUDENTS AND AECC UNIVERSITY COLLEGE AND ANY OTHER EXTERNAL BODIES; AND 3.3 PROVIDING SOCIAL, CULTURAL, SPORTING AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND FORUMS FOR DISCUSSION AND DEBATE FOR THE PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OF ITS STUDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
AECC Students' Union
Parkwood Campus
Parkwood Road
Bournemouth
Dorset
BH5 2DF
- Phone:
- 01202436293
- Email:
- SUExec@aecc.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window