NETHERTON JUNIOR FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of football to all children regardless of ability, gender or race within a safe and encouraging environment
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
45 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kirklees
Governance
- 16 June 2021: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart James Thornton | Chair | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tim Daniels | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Craig Scargill | Trustee | 16 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Geoffrey Nigel Dunn | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
VINAY JALOTA | Trustee | 16 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.92k | £48.65k | £54.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.24k | £44.14k | £43.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 09 May 2024 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 16 Jun 2021 as amended on 06 Jun 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN NETHERTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ASSOCIATION FOOTBALL (FACILITIES MEANS LAND, BUILDINGS, EQUIPMENT AND ORGANISING FOOTBALL ACTIVITIES).
Contact information
- Address:
-
HAWKROYD BANK ROAD
HUDDERSFIELD
HD4 7JW
- Phone:
- 07776138646
- Email:
- sgndunn@talk21.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window